LA SCR18 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council and its grassroots advocacy network, LaCAN, and designates April 26, 2017, as Disability Rights Day in Louisiana.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council and its grassroots advocacy network, LaCAN, and designates April 26, 2017, as Disability Rights Day in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#23) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-04-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |