LA SCR18 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the office of coastal protection and restoration and the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to jointly study shoreline protection, effects on marine species diversity and habitat quality, and economic and other ecosystem service values of the Sabine Reef.
Title
Requests the office of coastal protection and restoration and the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries to jointly study shoreline protection, effects on marine species diversity and habitat quality, and economic and other ecosystem service values of the Sabine Reef.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18, ADOPT (#254) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-05-24 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |