LA SCR15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/4.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to promote the department's EarlySteps system with the Louisiana Hospital Association, the Louisiana State Medical Society, and the Optometry Association of Louisiana.
Title
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to promote the department's EarlySteps system with the Louisiana Hospital Association, the Louisiana State Medical Society, and the Optometry Association of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 15, ADOPT (#450) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/4. | |
2012-04-24 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-04-23 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-04-23 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-04-23 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-04-19 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |
2012-04-18 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-13 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-03-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |