LA SCR143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Randy Lemoine who is retiring after thirty-five years with the Department of Health and Hospitals.
Title
Commends Dr. Randy Lemoine who is retiring after thirty-five years with the Department of Health and Hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 143, ADOPT (#1527) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-05-30 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-29 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |