LA SCR14 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes the United States Congress to enact the New Alternative Transportation to Give Americans Solutions Act of 2009.
Title
Memorializes the United States Congress to enact the New Alternative Transportation to Give Americans Solutions Act of 2009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 14, ADOPT (#8) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-25 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-25 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2010-05-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 25, 2010. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-05-19 | Reported favorably (14-0). | |
2010-03-30 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-03-29 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |