LA SCR133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends David Holmes on his academic achievements and impeccable leadership.
Title
Commends David Holmes on his academic achievements and impeccable leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 133 ADOPT (#853) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-08 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-06-07 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |