LA SCR133 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Baton Rouge chapter of Jack and Jill of America, Inc., upon the celebration of their fiftieth anniversary and designates May 21, 2014, as "Jack and Jill Day at the Capitol".
Title
Commends the Baton Rouge chapter of Jack and Jill of America, Inc., upon the celebration of their fiftieth anniversary and designates May 21, 2014, as "Jack and Jill Day at the Capitol".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 133 ADOPT (#838) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |