LA SCR13 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-52-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-52-3)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends and congratulates Danny Wilson on his forty-fifth service anniversary at AT&T Louisiana.
Title
Commends and congratulates Danny Wilson on his forty-fifth service anniversary at AT&T Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 13 ADOPT (#19) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |