LA SCR13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to pass the Disability Integration Act of 2017.
Title
Memorializes Congress to pass the Disability Integration Act of 2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SCR 13 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#979) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 13 ADOPT (#240) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 13 ADOPT (#240) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 80 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2018-04-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |