LA SCR13 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Anne Louise Hance Guidry.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Anne Louise Hance Guidry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 13 ADOPT (#40) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017. |
2017-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-02-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-02-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-02-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |