LA SCR115 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 89-51-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 89-51-4)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. James A. Richardson upon his 32 years of service and contributions to the Louisiana Revenue Estimating Conference.
Title
Commends Dr. James A. Richardson upon his 32 years of service and contributions to the Louisiana Revenue Estimating Conference.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 115 ADOPT (#444) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |