LA SCR115 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Bossier Parish Community College Lady Cavaliers softball team.
Title
Commends the Bossier Parish Community College Lady Cavaliers softball team.
Sponsors
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R] | Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] | Rep. Thomas Carmody [R] | Rep. Raymond Crews [R] |
Rep. Dodie Horton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 115 ADOPT (#1121) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |