LA SCR114 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Major Ron Chatelain, US Army, Retired on his service.
Title
Commends Major Ron Chatelain, US Army, Retired on his service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#1001) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |