LA SCR114 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Sherrie Hardie Thompson.
Title
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Sherrie Hardie Thompson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 114 ADOPT (#694) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |