LA SCR11 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the expansion of the Louisiana Veterans Memorial Park pursuant to the Capitol Complex Master Plan as envisioned by the Capitol Park Interpretive Plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the expansion of the Louisiana Veterans Memorial Park pursuant to the Capitol Complex Master Plan as envisioned by the Capitol Park Interpretive Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 CONCUR (#452) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 CO-AUTHORS (#453) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 11 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#663) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 ADOPT (#201) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-02SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2023-05-31HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2023-05-29SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2023-05-26SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2023-05-25SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2023-05-25HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
2023-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023.
2023-05-17HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-16HouseReported with amendments (8-0-1).
2023-05-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2023-05-04HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2023-05-04HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2023-05-04SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2023-05-03SenateReported favorably.
2023-04-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2023-04-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=SCR11&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310930
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326353
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1322485
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1321998
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310931
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1322487
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326046
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1334785
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1319038
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326018
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326343
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1326441

Bill Comments

feedback