LA SCR11 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Jerry Simmons on being named to the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Jerry Simmons on being named to the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 ADOPT (#18) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2018-05-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |