LA SCR11 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the United States Secretary of Education to visit Louisiana to tour public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the United States Secretary of Education to visit Louisiana to tour public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 11 SUSPEND THE RULES (#20) (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 ADOPT (#31) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11 SUSPEND THE RULES (#30) (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
2017-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-20SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-19SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-02-19HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2017-02-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2017-02-17HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback