LA SCR11 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special committee to study the process of redistricting or reapportionment.
Title
Creates a special committee to study the process of redistricting or reapportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 11, ADOPT (#901) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-06-01 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-29 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-29 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported favorably (8-0). | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-13 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-03-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |