LA SCR105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests DOTD to continue operation of the Edgard/Reserve and White Castle ferries and to prescribe and collect equitable ferry charges. (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Urges and requests DOTD to continue operation of the Edgard/Reserve and White Castle ferries and to prescribe and collect equitable ferry charges. (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Brown [D] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Sen. Rick Ward [R] | Rep. Randal Gaines [D] |
Sen. Gregory Miller [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] | Rep. Karen St Germain [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on SCR 105 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#959) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 105 ADOPT (#898) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 105 ADOPT (#898) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |