LA SCR101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regards a budget plan that provides funding established by a standstill budget and includes priority programs.
Title
Regards a budget plan that provides funding established by a standstill budget and includes priority programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 101 CONCUR (#1373) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SCR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1365) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 101 ADOPT (#1149) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SCR 101 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1365) (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 101 ADOPT (#1149) (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 85 yeas, 7 nays. |
2018-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2018-05-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |