LA SCR100 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study the impact on reducing the delays in carrying out a capital punishment sentence.
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study the impact on reducing the delays in carrying out a capital punishment sentence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 100 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#826) (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100 ADOPT (#627) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100 ADOPT (#627) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-07 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 0 nays. |
2015-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015. |
2015-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2015-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |