LA SCR100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study the deduction and withholding of certain oil and gas proceeds of out-of-state individuals and entities.
Title
Creates a task force to study the deduction and withholding of certain oil and gas proceeds of out-of-state individuals and entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100 ADOPT (#747) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |