LA SCR100 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the River Region Caucus of Louisiana.
Title
Create the River Region Caucus of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100, CONCUR (#1760) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100, ADOPT (#1464) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100, ADOPT (#1464) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05. | |
2012-06-04 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-04 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-04 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-06-03 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2012. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-06-03 | Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-30 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-29 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-05-28 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-05-09 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-08 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |