LA SCR100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners to work in collaboration through the Mental Health Professional Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2011.
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Board of Examiners of Psychologists and the Louisiana Licensed Professional Counselors Board of Examiners to work in collaboration through the Mental Health Professional Working Group to meet certain goals and to report to the Senate and House committees on health and welfare by February 1, 2011.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] | Sen. Willie Mount [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 100, ADOPT (#930) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/24. | |
2010-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-15 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-15 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2010. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2010-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |