LA SCR10 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/23/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on March 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/23/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaims March 21, 2022, as Louisiana State Capitol Colorectal Cancer Awareness Day in Louisiana.
Title
Proclaims March 21, 2022, as Louisiana State Capitol Colorectal Cancer Awareness Day in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 CO-AUTHORS (#20) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#19) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#19) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/23/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-03-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-03-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |