LA SCR10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation, Highways and Public Works Committee
Hearing: May 28 @ 11:00 am in Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Re-establishes the Lake Providence Watershed Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Re-establishes the Lake Providence Watershed Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#421) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback