LA SCR10 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to study extending the age of foster care to age twenty-one.
Title
Requests the Department of Children and Family Services to study extending the age of foster care to age twenty-one.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 CONCUR (#635) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#608) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#119) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Vote on SCR 10 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#608) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#119) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-04-27 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 79 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18. |
2018-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |