LA SCR10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Invites Madame Chief Justice Bernette Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court to address a joint session of the legislature on Tuesday, March 15, 2016, at 10:00 a.m.
Title
Invites Madame Chief Justice Bernette Johnson of the Louisiana Supreme Court to address a joint session of the legislature on Tuesday, March 15, 2016, at 10:00 a.m.
Sponsors
Sen. John Alario [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#4) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-03-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-03-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |