LA SCR10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Smokin' Oldies Cook-Off in West Baton Rouge Parish as an official Louisiana State barbeque championship.
Title
Designates the Smokin' Oldies Cook-Off in West Baton Rouge Parish as an official Louisiana State barbeque championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] | Rep. Major Thibaut [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10 ADOPT (#339) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |