LA SCR10 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DOTD to install a left turn signal at the intersection of Eddie Robinson and Government Street in Baton Rouge.
Title
Requests DOTD to install a left turn signal at the intersection of Eddie Robinson and Government Street in Baton Rouge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 10, ADOPT (#12) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18. | |
2012-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-05-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-07 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |
2012-03-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-03-13 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-13 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-03-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |