LA SCR1 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Frank Leonard.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Frank Leonard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 1 ADOPT (#7) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/2/2020. |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-09-30 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-09-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |