LA SCR1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends Chapter 7 of Subtitle II of Title 11 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 1399.1 through 1399.7. (RE DECREASE FC GF & SG EX)
Title
Suspends Chapter 7 of Subtitle II of Title 11 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 1399.1 through 1399.7. (RE DECREASE FC GF & SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 1 ADOPT (#250) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-16 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |