LA SB99 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Development District. (See Act)
Title
Provides relative to the St. Tammany Parish Development District. (See Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 99 CONCUR (#670) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 99 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 99 FINAL PASSAGE (#202) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 99 FINAL PASSAGE (#615) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 99 FINAL PASSAGE (#202) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 242. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17. |
2017-05-25 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2017-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |