LA SB98 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective date 1/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sellers of motion picture investor tax credits to qualify for and be included in a Public Registry of Motion Picture Investor Tax Credit Brokers. (1/1/16) (EN +$60,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires sellers of motion picture investor tax credits to qualify for and be included in a Public Registry of Motion Picture Investor Tax Credit Brokers. (1/1/16) (EN +$60,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 98 CONCUR (#969) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#769) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#769) (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 98 FINAL PASSAGE (#255) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2016. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 451. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2015-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 4. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. |
2015-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |