LA SB97 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the LA Sheriff's Executive Management Institute. (8/1/12) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the LA Sheriff's Executive Management Institute. (8/1/12) (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 97, CONCUR (#1148) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#919) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on SB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#919) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 97, FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 350. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-21 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-05-17 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-30 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-03-28 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-27 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-21 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-02-20 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |