LA SB91 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 6/24/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 6/24/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the sale of certain school property by the Natchitoches Parish School Board and the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education. (8/15/11)
Title
Authorizes the sale of certain school property by the Natchitoches Parish School Board and the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education. (8/15/11)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 91, CONCUR (#595) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - House Vote on SB 91, FINAL PASSAGE (#528) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 91, FINAL PASSAGE (#116) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - House - House Vote on SB 91, FINAL PASSAGE (#528) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 91, FINAL PASSAGE (#116) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Effective date 6/24/11. | |
2011-06-24 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 139. | |
2011-06-19 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/17. | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-13 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-13 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011. | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent. | |
2011-06-02 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-01 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-10 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-09 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |