LA SB8 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date 6/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date 6/30/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for correction of membership and enrollment errors in the state and statewide retirement systems. (2/3 - CA10s29(F)) (6/30/17) (EN SEE BELOW)
Title
Provides for correction of membership and enrollment errors in the state and statewide retirement systems. (2/3 - CA10s29(F)) (6/30/17) (EN SEE BELOW)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#713) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 8 FINAL PASSAGE (#122) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2017. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 285. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17. |
2017-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (5-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2017-04-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |