LA SB79 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Effective date 8/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Cybersecurity Talent Initiative Fund for the purpose of funding degree and certificate programs in cybersecurity fields and creates the Cybersecurity Education Management Council to advise relative to the fund. (8/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Louisiana Cybersecurity Talent Initiative Fund for the purpose of funding degree and certificate programs in cybersecurity fields and creates the Cybersecurity Education Management Council to advise relative to the fund. (8/1/20) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#443) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#139) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 79 FINAL PASSAGE (#139) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2020. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 57. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |