LA SB78 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increases medical malpractice cap for certain child brain injuries. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases medical malpractice cap for certain child brain injuries. (gov sig) (EG NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-18SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2016-05-18SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2016-05-17SenateRead by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2016-05-16SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2016-04-20SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
2016-04-19SenateReported with amendments.
2016-03-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2016-03-01SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback