LA SB765 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Sledge Jeansonne Louisiana Insurance Fraud Prevention Act. (8/1/12) (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Title
Creates the Sledge Jeansonne Louisiana Insurance Fraud Prevention Act. (8/1/12) (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 765, CONCUR (#1707) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 765, FINAL PASSAGE (#1476) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 765, FINAL PASSAGE (#1029) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 765, FINAL PASSAGE (#1476) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 765, FINAL PASSAGE (#1029) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 862. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-05-16 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-15 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-10 | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 251. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |