LA SB76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to child safety seats. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to child safety seats. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback