LA SB76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Effective date 8/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to child safety seats. (8/1/19)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to child safety seats. (8/1/19)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#596) (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 CO-AUTHORS (#111) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#110) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-01SenateEffective date 8/1/2019.
2019-06-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 51.
2019-05-30SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2019-05-28HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-28SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-27SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-23HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-23HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-04-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-22SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB76&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118907
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125436
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126701
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137782
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141920
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1124037
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126191
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118908
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126152
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126803
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1145192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126636
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126638
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137470

Bill Comments

feedback