LA SB76 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date 6/20/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Effective date 6/20/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for use of monies in the Louisiana Medical Assistance Trust Fund. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for use of monies in the Louisiana Medical Assistance Trust Fund. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#765) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#765) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#765) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 76 FINAL PASSAGE (#752) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Effective date 6/20/2013. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 409. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-06-02 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-06-02 | House | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |