LA SB75 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Passed on June 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-03 - Effective date 6/3/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Passed on June 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-03 - Effective date 6/3/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the crimes of failure to report a missing child and failure to report death of a child. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates the crimes of failure to report a missing child and failure to report death of a child. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 75, FINAL PASSAGE (#1122) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 75, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 75, CO-AUTHORS (#79) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 75, FINAL PASSAGE (#80) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 75, CO-AUTHORS (#79) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-03 | Effective date 6/3/12. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 477. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-28 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2012. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-11 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-27 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-21 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-20 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2012-02-13 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |