LA SB72 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for an additional member to the board of commissioners of the Ernest N. Morial - New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority. (gov sig) (EGF NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for an additional member to the board of commissioners of the Ernest N. Morial - New Orleans Exhibition Hall Authority. (gov sig) (EGF NO IMPACT LF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#588) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 72 FINAL PASSAGE (#203) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/19.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-14HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2019-05-13HouseReported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-05-01HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-01SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-29SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
2019-03-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=SB72&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118899
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127642
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127457
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133479
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133179
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134498
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135434
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137483
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1118900
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129374
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133229
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130097
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1137456

Bill Comments

feedback