LA SB72 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-06 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the deadline for application to receive tax credits or rebates relative to the Louisiana Quality Jobs Program. (8/15/11) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Title
To extend the deadline for application to receive tax credits or rebates relative to the Louisiana Quality Jobs Program. (8/15/11) (EN DECREASE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Alario [R] | Sen. Conrad Appel [R] | Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] | Rep. Kay Katz [R] |
Sen. Daniel Martiny [R] | Sen. Michael Michot [R] | Rep. Jane Smith [R] | Sen. John Smith [R] |
Rep. Francis Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SB 72, FINAL PASSAGE (#602) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 72, FINAL PASSAGE (#240) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 72, FINAL PASSAGE (#240) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-06 | Effective date 8/15/11. | |
2011-07-06 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410. | |
2011-06-16 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-06-07 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2011-06-06 | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-05-24 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |