LA SB71 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the criminalistics laboratory operated by the sheriff of Jefferson Parish. (8/1/12)
Title
Provides for the criminalistics laboratory operated by the sheriff of Jefferson Parish. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - House - House Vote on SB 71, FINAL PASSAGE (#1236) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 71, FINAL PASSAGE (#302) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 71, FINAL PASSAGE (#302) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 619. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-30 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-29 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-04-10 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-09 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-04 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-03 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-02-10 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |