LA SB708 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-22-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-22-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that notice and election form be provided to, the fetal heartbeat be made audible to, and ultrasound images be displayed for review by, a pregnant woman prior to an abortion. (8/1/12)
Title
Requires that notice and election form be provided to, the fetal heartbeat be made audible to, and ultrasound images be displayed for review by, a pregnant woman prior to an abortion. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, CONCUR (#1583) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 708, ADD CO-AUTHORS (#1331) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 708, FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, CO-AUTHORS (#490) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, AMENDMENT # 2942 BY CLAITOR, SB 708 BY BROOME (#488) (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 708, ADD CO-AUTHORS (#1331) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 58) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 708, FINAL PASSAGE (#1327) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, CO-AUTHORS (#490) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, FINAL PASSAGE (#489) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 708, AMENDMENT # 2942 BY CLAITOR, SB 708 BY BROOME (#488) (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 685. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-26 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-25 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-24 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-18 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |