LA SB707 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Excepts certain records obtained by the legislature for the purpose of election, confirmation, or approval from the provisions of public records law. (8/1/12)
Title
Excepts certain records obtained by the legislature for the purpose of election, confirmation, or approval from the provisions of public records law. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Amedee [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 707, CONCUR (#1679) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#1428) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - House Vote on SB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#1428) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 707, FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 850. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-01 | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-24 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported with amendments (7-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-08 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-05-07 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-03 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |