LA SB700 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the parish office of homeland security and emergency preparedness to establish a voluntary registry of persons with special needs. (8/1/12)
Title
Requires the parish office of homeland security and emergency preparedness to establish a voluntary registry of persons with special needs. (8/1/12)
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 700, FINAL PASSAGE (#456) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2012. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-23 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-04-19 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-04-19 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-04-18 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-04-17 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-03 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |